Subscribe via Email:

# Trick To Speed Up Maths Calculation : Multiplication Of Two Double-Digit Numbers

Written by on 28 June 2011

# Trick To Speed Up Maths Calculation : Multiplication Of Two Double-Digit Numbers

IDEA : If the base (the digit at ten's place is considered as a base) of both the numbers are same then only this trick is applicable. For example : 57*53 can be easily done while for 23*17, this trick doesn't work!

QUE : Multiply 57 and 53.

STEP 1 : Multiply digits at one's place of both the numbers.

STEP 2 : Add the numbers as shown below and place it accordingly.

STEP 3 : The base is the digit at the ten's place. Remember that it should be same for both the numbers for the trick to work.

STEP 4 : Now add the numbers as we add them in any normal/conventional multiplication problem.

ANS : Thus, 53 * 57 yields 3021.

Try Yourself :

1) 32 * 37

2) 67 * 62

3) 91 * 93

4) 23 * 37

Note : In the last problem, you can not apply this trick. So better is to use the conventional approach or any other trick that you know.

Tip : This method will require a lot of practice as the conventional method which we have been using since years can not be easily replaced when it comes to instantaneous calculation.

Feel free to post comments if you have any doubts or a more efficient way that you know.

Your feedback is important to mark the success of Mathematics!

• IDEA : If the base (the digit at ten's place is considered as a base) of both the numbers are same then only this trick is applicable. For example : 57*53 can be easily done while for 23*17, this trick doesn't work!

### Recommended Websites!

Websites mentioned above are works of colleagues/friends of people working at [OC] offclassroom.